Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vann, Zachary Chandler, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kakadelas, Kim James, against Flaherty, Marcy, represented by Houze-Benson, Elysa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint filed by VANN, ZACHARY CHANDLER. Refers to: FLAHERTY, MARCY
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Original Summons filed by VANN, ZACHARY CHANDLER.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by VANN, ZACHARY CHANDLER.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by VANN, ZACHARY CHANDLER.
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by FLAHERTY, MARCY.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by FLAHERTY, MARCY.
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement filed by DOMINSKI, DEBRA A.
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by FLAHERTY, MARCY.
Date: February 01, 2022Mediator Selection Form filed by VANN, ZACHARY CHANDLER.
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by VANN, ZACHARY CHANDLER.
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00General Denial filed by FLAHERTY, MARCY.
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/05/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.