Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Patterson Dental Supply Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Tiberi, Sandra I, against Rubinkan, Shen J; Dba : Stephen J. Rubinkan Dds, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl H. Maas, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Patterson Dental Supply Inc.
Date: February 01, 2021Sister-State Judgment filed by Patterson Dental Supply Inc. Refers to: Rubinkan, Shen
Date: December 17, 2020Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 04/08/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: April 08, 2022Proof of Service filed by Patterson Dental Supply Inc.
Date: March 04, 2022Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: March 11, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: December 17, 2020Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Patterson Dental Supply Inc.
Date: April 11, 2022Sister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by Patterson Dental Supply Inc. Refers to: Rubinkan, Shen
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Patterson Dental Supply Inc. Refers to: Rubinkan, Shen
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.