Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jordan, Carina M., against San Miguel, Lina D, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: December 01, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: San Miguel, Lina
Date: November 30, 2020Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: San Miguel, Lina
Date: November 30, 2020Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank.
Date: August 18, 2022Declaration - Other (Statement of Venue) filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: San Miguel, Lina
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.
Date: July 30, 2022Proof of Service filed by Discover Bank.
Date: December 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.