National Funding Inc,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Muren, Tara,
against
Edwards Ii, Michael,
Elite Automotive Consulting Inc; Dba : Aamco Transmissions,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Details for
National Funding Inc v. Edwards Ii, Michael
, et al.
Case Events for
National Funding Inc v. Edwards Ii, Michael
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
March 02, 2021
Docket Event
Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by National Funding Inc.
March 02, 2021
Docket Event
Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by National Funding Inc.
February 19, 2021
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: ELITE AUTOMOTIVE CONSULTING INC; EDWARDS II, MICHAEL
February 19, 2021
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for National Funding Inc and against EDWARDS II, MICHAEL ;ELITE AUTOMOTIVE CONSULTING INC for $ 56884.66, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 2468.84, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 955.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 60308.50.
February 19, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti was vacated.
February 16, 2021
Docket Event
Application for Entry of Judgment (with dismissal of Does and supporting declarations) filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: EDWARDS II, MICHAEL; ELITE AUTOMOTIVE CONSULTING INC
February 11, 2021
Docket Event
Default entered as to EDWARDS II, MICHAEL on Complaint filed by National Funding Inc .
February 11, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default filed by National Funding Inc. Refers to: EDWARDS II, MICHAEL; ELITE AUTOMOTIVE CONSULTING INC
February 11, 2021
Docket Event
Default entered as to ELITE AUTOMOTIVE CONSULTING INC on Complaint filed by National Funding Inc .
January 19, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Elite Automotive) filed by National Funding Inc.