Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Armas, Octavio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Petrov, Daniel, against Heineman, Thomas, represented by Montgomery, Brooke Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Richard S. Whitney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard S. Whitney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Heineman, Thomas.
Date: February 08, 2021Demand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees) filed by Heineman, Thomas.
Date: February 08, 2021[Another document for ROA# 6]
Date: November 30, 2020Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Complaint filed by Armas, Octavio. Refers to: Heineman, Thomas
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Armas, Octavio. Refers to: Heineman, Thomas
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Armas, Octavio.
Date: June 24, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Heineman, Thomas.
Date: February 08, 2021Original Summons filed by Armas, Octavio. Refers to: Heineman, Thomas
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Answer filed by Heineman, Thomas.
Date: February 08, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.