Progressive Direct Insurance Company,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Nivinskus, Mark R,
against
Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra,
Pachuca-Diaz, Consuelo,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Details for
Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra
, et al.
Case Events for
Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
May 24, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.
April 15, 2021
Docket Event
The default has been vacated as to Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra; Pachuca-Diaz, Consuelo listed on the Complaint filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.
April 12, 2021
Docket Event
Stipulation to Set Aside Default Judgment Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Set Aside Default Judgment) filed by Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra; Pachuca-Diaz, Consuelo; Progressive Direct Insurance Company.
March 16, 2021
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.
March 15, 2021
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Progressive Direct Insurance Company and against Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra ;Pachuca-Diaz, Consuelo for $ 64704.36, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 573.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 65277.36.
March 15, 2021
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Refers to: Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra; Pachuca-Diaz, Consuelo
March 09, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (with Dismissal of DOES and Supporting Documents) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Refers to: Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra; Pachuca-Diaz, Consuelo
March 09, 2021
Docket Event
The default filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company was entered as to Pachuca-Diaz, Alondra; Pachuca-Diaz, Consuelo on Complaint . Override feature used.
January 07, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (as to Consuelo Diaz) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.
January 07, 2021
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Alondra Pachuca-Diaz) filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.