Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
James, Dona, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mower, Jon R.; Wheatley, William G Jr, Wheatley, William G Jr, against Brim, Paula, San Diego American Indian Health Center, represented by Amundson, Steven, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Gregory W Pollack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
[Another document for ROA# 7]
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Complaint filed by James, Dona. Refers to: San Diego American Indian Health Center; Brim, Paula
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/07/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: August 20, 2021Association of Attorney filed by James, Dona.
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed by James, Dona.
Date: March 25, 2022Original Summons filed by James, Dona. Refers to: San Diego American Indian Health Center; Brim, Paula
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Answer filed by Brim, Paula; San Diego American Indian Health Center.
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Brim, Paula; San Diego American Indian Health Center.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by James, Dona.
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by James, Dona.
Date: March 25, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/20/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Brim, Paula; San Diego American Indian Health Center.
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.