Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ellis Ford, Denita, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lebe, Jonathan, against Alvarado Hospital Llc; Dba : Alvarado Hospital, Prime Healthcare Services Inc, represented by Mesropyan, Vahe; Ross, Sarah E, Ross, Sarah E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Richard S. Whitney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Answer filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jonathan M Lebe) filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Answer filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC; Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice - Other (of counsel contact) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (In Support of Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Motions to Compel) filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (In Support of Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Response (to separate statement) filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Sarah Ross) filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Sara Turner) filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jonathan M. Lebe) filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/21/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Stay) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Prime Healthcare Services Inc received but not filed on 04/01/2022.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC; Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Motion - Other (to Compel Arbitration) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF SARA TURNER) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF SARAH E. ROSS) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC; Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 06/23/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: June 23, 2023Complaint filed by Ellis Ford, Denita. Refers to: Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Reply filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF SARA TURNER) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Response (to separate statement) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Sarah Ross) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Sara Turner) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC; Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/23/2022 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Reply filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC; Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: December 19, 2023Declaration - Other (OF SARAH E. ROSS) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Status Report filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: March 14, 2024Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Status Report filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: June 08, 2023Notice of Appearance filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: November 29, 2023Request for Judicial Notice filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF SARA E ROSS) filed by Prime Healthcare Services Inc; Alvarado Hospital LLC.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Alvarado Hospital LLC; Prime Healthcare Services Inc.
Date: 2022-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Ellis Ford, Denita.
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/22/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: December 22, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.