Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Enriquez, Daniel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jorgensen, Richard Allen, against Mittman, Timothy, represented by Luebke, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Caietti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020
Date: 2020-11-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Enriquez, Daniel.
Date: October 22, 2021Demand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees) filed by Mittman, Timothy.
Date: December 17, 2020Case Management Statement filed by Mittman, Timothy.
Date: December 17, 2020Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: September 18, 2021Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Mittman, Timothy.
Date: December 17, 2020Answer filed by Mittman, Timothy.
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: June 18, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.