Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams, Katherine, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Smaili, Jihad M, against Acadia Healthcare Company Inc; Dba : Mission Treatment Services Inc, represented by Burns, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia A. Freeland presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia A. Freeland Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice - Other filed by Williams, Katherine.
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Acadia Healthcare Company Inc.
Date: June 28, 2021Answer filed by Acadia Healthcare Company Inc. Refers to: Williams, Katherine
Date: June 24, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Williams, Katherine.
Date: June 03, 2021Original Summons filed by Williams, Katherine. Refers to: Acadia Healthcare Company Inc
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Williams, Katherine.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Katherine. Refers to: Acadia Healthcare Company Inc
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Complaint filed by Williams, Katherine. Refers to: Acadia Healthcare Company Inc
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Williams, Katherine.
Date: June 03, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.