Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Martini, Peter, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bailey, Micah L, against Del Dosso, Linda, Del Dosso, Mark, represented by Ponist, Sean E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Katherine Bacal presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Martini, Peter. Refers to: Del Dosso, Mark; Del Dosso, Linda
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Martini, Peter.
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Complaint filed by Martini, Peter. Refers to: Del Dosso, Mark; Del Dosso, Linda
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Answer filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Martini, Peter. Refers to: Del Dosso, Mark; Del Dosso, Linda
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Reply filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: May 14, 2021Declaration - Other (of Sean Ponist) filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Martini, Peter.
Date: May 11, 2021Proof of Service filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: May 14, 2021Case Management Statement filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 03/05/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated. | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply in support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Cal. Const. Art. VI, section 4 and/or Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and for Attorney Fees/Costs Reply filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark. |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated. | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Del Dosso, Linda; Del Dosso, Mark. | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Martini, Peter. | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Del Dosso, Linda . | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Del Dosso, Mark . | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Martini, Peter . | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Martini, Peter. | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail filed by Martini, Peter. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.