Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kramer, Kyle, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Sherman, Sam G, against Gaston, Frederick Wilson, represented by Frost, Thomas C, Gaston, Frederick W, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Undertaking filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations (Of Jessica L Mulvaney) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Thomas C Frost) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Answer filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Gaston, Frederick W. Refers to: Kramer, Kyle
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jessica L. Mulvaney) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Compel further responses to special interrogatories) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Kramer, Kyle received but not filed on 06/29/2021.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Frederick W Gaston) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Compel further responsese to requests for admissions) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/01/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Gaston, Frederick Wilson received but not filed on 09/14/2021.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick W.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Answer filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: March 30, 2022Motion to Continue Trial filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: March 30, 2022Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/25/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to Compel Further Responses) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: April 01, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: March 30, 2022E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: April 11, 2022Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of Order to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 02/18/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/24/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: April 12, 2022Proof of Service filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Kramer, Kyle received but not filed on 03/23/2022.
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF JESSICA L. MULVANEY) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 7]
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kramer, Kyle. Refers to: Gaston, Frederick; Omega Family Global Inc
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Complaint filed by Kramer, Kyle. Refers to: Gaston, Frederick; Omega Family Global Inc
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for order to show cause) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kyle Kramer in Support of Ex Parte Application) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/30/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Order - Other (PLF NOTICE AND EXP ARTE APP FOR OSC AND TRO) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (in support of ex parte application for order to show cause) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to motion for preliminary injunction) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Objections filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Jamie Ramsay in opposition) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (of opposition, declarations) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Objections filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/14/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Proposed Order (requiring plaintiff Kyle Kramer to furnish a bond) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Order - Other (ORDER ON PLF KYLE KRAMER MOTION FOR PRELIM INJ) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/10/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Sam G. Sherman) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Bond Motion) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Kramer, Kyle received but not filed on 08/17/2020.
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kyle Kramer) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations (Of Sam G Sherman) filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Opposition - Other (To Plaintiff Kyle Kramers Motion to Consolidate) filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Objections filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/30/2020 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/28/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Objections filed by Gaston, Frederick Wilson.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/30/2020 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Kramer, Kyle received but not filed on 09/14/2020.
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Kramer, Kyle.
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.