Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavallo, Joseph Peter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Clune, John O, Malek, Marianne M, against Cook, Carrie Marie, Dal-Tile Services Inc; Esa : Mohawk Industries Inc, Emkay Inc; Dba : Emkay Inc Illinois, Emkay Inc Trust Lsr, represented by Houze-Benson, Elysa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Cavallo, Joseph Peter.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Cook, Carrie Marie; Dal-Tile Services Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cavallo, Joseph Peter.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cook, Carrie Marie; Dal-Tile Services Inc.
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cook, Carrie Marie; Dal-Tile Services Inc.
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cavallo, Joseph Peter.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Answer filed by Cook, Carrie Marie; Mohawk Industries Inc.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Cavallo, Joseph Peter.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Cook, Carrie Marie; Dal-Tile Services Inc.
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/09/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Objections filed by Cavallo, Joseph Peter.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cavallo, Joseph Peter.
Date: August 02, 2021Substitution of Attorney filed by Cavallo, Joseph Peter.
Date: April 28, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.