Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pinheiro, Carolina, against Mclemore, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula S. Rosenstein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.
Date: July 30, 2022Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: MCLEMORE, Stephen
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: January 02, 2020Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: MCLEMORE, Stephen
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: MCLEMORE, Stephen
Date: January 21, 2020Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.
Date: January 12, 2020Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 10/19/2023 09:30:00 AM.
Date: October 19, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: MCLEMORE, Stephen
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023.
Date: March 18, 2023OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 10/19/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in 1604 .
Date: September 25, 2023Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: MCLEMORE, Stephen
Date: November 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.