Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Td Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Berk, Camryn P, against Soto, Erica L, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Soto, Erica
Date: December 31, 2019Original Summons filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Soto, Erica
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: January 02, 2020Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.
Date: January 12, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Soto, Erica
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Soto, Erica
Date: February 05, 2020Declaration of Non-Service filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Soto, Erica
Date: January 22, 2020Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by TD Bank USA NA.
Date: February 25, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.