Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
On Deck Capital Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lee, Yejoo, against Fast Fuller Inc, Fuller, Vince, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn Caietti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn Caietti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/22/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Summary of the Case) filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: April 05, 2021Order - Other filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by On Deck Capital Inc. Refers to: Fast Fuller Inc
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by On Deck Capital Inc. Refers to: Fuller, Vince
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by On Deck Capital Inc. Refers to: Fast Fuller Inc; Fuller, Vince
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/23/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Complaint filed by On Deck Capital Inc. Refers to: Fast Fuller Inc; Fuller, Vince
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by On Deck Capital Inc. Refers to: Fuller, Vince
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020
Date: 2020-11-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (Case Management Conference) filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Original Summons filed by On Deck Capital Inc. Refers to: Fast Fuller Inc; Fuller, Vince
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: April 05, 2021Order - Other (N/A) filed by On Deck Capital Inc.
Date: April 05, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.