Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brinkerhoff, Kristen L, against Alfiler, Vanessa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time147 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Alfiler, Vanessa
Date: December 31, 2019Original Summons filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Refers to: Alfiler, Vanessa
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration of Non-Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC.
Date: January 09, 2020Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.
Date: January 12, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.