Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sanders, Justin Michael, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Sim von Kalinowski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSim von Kalinowski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Proof of Service by Publication filed by SANDERS, JUSTIN MICHAEL.
Date: February 03, 2020Case initiation form printed.
Date: December 31, 2019Minutes finalized for Hearing on Name Change heard 02/18/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: February 18, 2020Order to Show Cause for Change of Name filed by SANDERS, JUSTIN MICHAEL.
Date: December 31, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SANDERS, JUSTIN MICHAEL.
Date: December 31, 2019Petition for Change of Name filed by SANDERS, JUSTIN MICHAEL.
Date: December 31, 2019Decree Changing Name (GRANTED) filed by SANDERS, JUSTIN MICHAEL.
Date: February 19, 2020Proposed Decree Change Name submitted by SANDERS, JUSTIN MICHAEL received but not filed on 12/31/2019.
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.