Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ian Moore As The Successor-In-Interest To The Estate Of Katrina Moore, Moore, Ian, Moore, Rush, Moore, Savannah, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dingwall, Jeff R, Joyce, John P; Low, Joseph H Iv, Low, Joseph H Iv, against Poseidon Resources Channelside Gp Inc, Poseidon Resources, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice - Other (of defendant Sempra Energy demurrer) filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Answer filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Demurrer filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Answer filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Daniel S Modafferi) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Demurrer) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by City of Carlsbad received but not filed on 05/26/2020.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of demurrer to complaint) filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Answer filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (of demurrer to plaintiffs complaint) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Answer (to Cross Complaint of YMCA of San Diego County) filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 06/09/2020 01:45:00 PM.
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (of notice, memorandum of points and authorities, declaration) filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kimberlie C Raines in support of demurrer to complaint) filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sempra Energy; San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF CONTINUED HEARING) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Answer filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by NRG Energy Inc; Cabrillo Power 1 LLC.
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEE) filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Sempra Energy.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Reply filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/02/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Sempra Energy.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Amended Answer filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (demurrer, notice, memorandum, request, proposed order) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/23/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (of Amended Answer) filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Daniel S Modafferi) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (of demurrer to first amended complaint) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Demurrer filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike (portions of first amended complaint) filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Answer filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Moore, Savannah.
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/18/2021 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Informal Discovery Conference (Civil) heard 12/29/2020 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Answer filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 141]
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company; Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Moore, Rush.
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/21/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Order - Other (on Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint) filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Reply (Supplemental reply) filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Objections filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Separate Statement (in support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 12/03/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by San Diego Gas & Electric Company received but not filed on 12/13/2021.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Carlos Riva) filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Poseidon Water LLC received but not filed on 12/15/2021.
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Warren L Gilbert) filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kimberli C. Raines) filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Sempra Energy received but not filed on 12/13/2021.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Sempra Energy.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kimberli C. Raines) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 344]
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Kimberli C. Raines) filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/30/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (As Amended)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 348)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric Company.
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Exhibit List (in support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Moore, Ian; Moore, Rush; Moore, Savannah.
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/06/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Cabrillo Power I LLC received but not filed on 10/27/2022.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Poseidon Resources (Channelside) LP; Poseidon Resources Channelside GP Inc.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (VALERIE GARCIA HONG) filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Cross Complaint) filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record (as to ROA #383) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Poseidon Resources (Channelside) LP; Poseidon Resources Channelside GP Inc.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Informal Discovery Conference (Civil) heard 11/16/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/03/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by IAN MOORE as the Successor-In-Interest to THE ESTATE OF KATRINA MOORE.
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record (as to ROA #384) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: August 02, 2023Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/05/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Poseidon Resources Channelside GP Inc.
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Poseidon Resources (Channelside) LP.
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Poseidon Resources Channelside GP Inc.
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Poseidon Resources (Channelside) LP received but not filed on 12/29/2022.
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Motion for Bifurcation filed by Poseidon Resources (Channelside) LP.
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Poseidon Resources Channelside GP Inc received but not filed on 01/04/2023.
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/20/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: January 20, 2023Reply filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Answer (First Amended Complaint) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Answer filed by Cantor Enterprises Inc.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Answer filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Answer filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Poseidon Water LLC received but not filed on 04/07/2021.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Answer filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Demurrer (Demurrer to Pltf's SAC) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Defendant's Demurrer to Pltf's SAC) filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by City of Carlsbad received but not filed on 05/18/2021.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/16/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (evidence in support) filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Answer filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by YMCA of San Diego County received but not filed on 07/27/2021.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Valerie Garcia Hong) filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint (First) filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 08/13/2021 11:15:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Scott Smith) filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Answer filed by NRG Energy Inc; Cabrillo Power I LLC.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Answer filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power 1 LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Carlsbad.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Answer filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Objections filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by YMCA of San Diego County.
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Objections (to Plaintiffs' evidence) filed by Cabrillo Power I LLC; NRG Energy Inc.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/15/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Poseidon Water LLC.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.