Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capelianis, Carmen D, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Asiano, Philip L, against Affiliate Escrow Inc, Bump-Murillo, Manuela, Da Silva, Paulo, Agent'S Capital Inc; Aka : Agents' Capital Inc, Barksdale, Derek Adrian; Dba : Military Mutual, (total of 7) See All represented by Donohoo, Rodney L, Kanter, Elliott, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Meyer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial323 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration - Other filed by Agent's Capital Inc; Yarpezeshkan, Jesse; Realtor's Capital Inc.
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Agent's Capital Inc; Yarpezeshkan, Jesse; Realtor's Capital Inc.
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA 7) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Capelianis, Carmen D. Refers to: Garcia, Juan; PES Developers Inc
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Answer filed by Da Silva, Paulo.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request for Payment of Trust Funds filed by Reichenberg, Karine. Refers to: Agent's Capital Inc
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Answer filed by Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa; Barksdale, Derek.
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Original Summons (on Cross-Complaint) filed by Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa; Barksdale, Derek.
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Cornell, Maurice D. Refers to: Da Silva, Paulo
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Yarpezeshkan, Jesse.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Garcia, Juan P; PES Developers Inc.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Da Silva, Paulo.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Agent's Capital Inc; Yarpezeshkan, Jesse; Realtor's Capital Inc.
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/04/2020 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Hearing on Compromise of Claim heard 03/03/2021 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Garcia, Juan P; PES Developers Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Philip Asano) filed by Capelianis, Carmen D.
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/15/2021 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Request for Payment of Trust Funds filed by Reichenberg, Karine. Refers to: Heimaster, Teresa
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Garcia, Juan P; PES Developers Inc.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Opposition - Other (Opposition to Ex Parte) filed by Capelianis, Carmen D.
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Cornell, Maurice D; Barksdale, Derek; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Notice - Other (amended notice) filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/22/2021 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Objections filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Motion for Bifurcation filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF LORENA ROEL) filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Answer filed by Affiliate Escrow Inc.
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Statement - Other (AFFILIATE ESCROW'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT) filed by Affiliate Escrow Inc.
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/17/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition filed by Agent's Capital Inc; Yarpezeshkan, Jesse; Realtor's Capital Inc.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF JOINDER) filed by Affiliate Escrow Inc.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Objections filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Hearing on Compromise of Claim heard 07/08/2021 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Objections filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by PES Developers Inc; Garcia, Juan P.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Answer filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Answer filed by Da Silva, Paulo.
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/02/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to Joint Motion) filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/18/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/27/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Bump-Murillo, Manuela; Bump-Murillo, Manuela.
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/11/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Joinder to Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Affiliate Escrow Inc.
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition filed by Agent's Capital Inc; Yarpezeshkan, Jesse; Realtor's Capital Inc.
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/02/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Reichenberg, Karine.
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not entered) filed by Barksdale, Derek; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Yarpezeshkan, Jesse; Realtor's Capital Inc.
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/14/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Barksdale, Derek; Cornell, Maurice D; Heimaster, Teresa.
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/01/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Elliott N Kanter) filed by PES Developers Inc; Garcia, Juan P.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 01/28/2022 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.