Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Karayan, Sarkis S, against Martinez, Antonia F, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Refers to: Martinez, Antonia
Date: September 04, 2019Judgment by Default by Court filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Refers to: Martinez, Antonia
Date: January 05, 2021Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 05, 2019Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Refers to: Martinez, Antonia
Date: September 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Refers to: Martinez, Antonia
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/12/2020.
Date: January 12, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.