Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Valdovino, Felipe, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Chae, Larry W, against Ford Motor Company, represented by Shields, Robert A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial336 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Valdovino, Felipe.
Date: December 15, 2020Peremptory Challenge filed by Valdovino, Felipe.
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Complaint filed by Valdovino, Felipe. Refers to: Ford Motor Company
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Valdovino, Felipe. Refers to: Ford Motor Company
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to John Meyer effective 09/19/2019
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Valdovino, Felipe.
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Valdovino, Felipe. Refers to: Ford Motor Company
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Answer filed by Ford Motor Company.
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Ford Motor Company.
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Valdovino, Felipe.
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.