Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
A-1 Pumpcrete Inc filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Cycle Time400 days |
Complaint filed by Cox, Roseanne. Refers to: A-1 Pumpcrete INC
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cox, Roseanne. Refers to: A-1 Pumpcrete INC
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by A-1 Pumpcrete INC. Refers to: Cox, Roseanne
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet (Amended) filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by A-1 Pumpcrete INC.
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order - Other (ORDER SIGNED 11/5/19) filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/03/2020 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by A-1 Pumpcrete INC.
Date: June 03, 2020Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by A-1 Pumpcrete INC.
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Answer filed by A-1 Pumpcrete INC.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/25/2019 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - nonagreement filed by SELLECK, JOANN.
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Answer filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: May 26, 2020Case Management Statement filed by A-1 Pumpcrete INC.
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/18/2019 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cox, Roseanne.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.