Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cruz, Ivana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kroger Diamond, Catharine E, against Pruett, Michelle, Pruett, Eric, represented by Lutz, William R, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Richard E. L. Strauss presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial262 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time449 days |
Demand for Jury Trial (with Proof of Service) filed by Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle.
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cruz, Ivana. Refers to: Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle.
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Cruz, Ivana. Refers to: Pruett, Eric
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Unavailability of Counsel) filed by Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle.
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cruz, Ivana.
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Cruz, Ivana.
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cruz, Ivana.
Date: July 22, 2020Complaint filed by Cruz, Ivana. Refers to: Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Mediator Selection Form filed by Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Cruz, Ivana. Refers to: Pruett, Eric; Pruett, Michelle
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Mediator Selection Form filed by Cruz, Ivana.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/17/2020 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.