Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A.,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Kabir, Rose,
against
Gonzalez, Nancy,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A. v. Gonzalez, Nancy
Case Events for
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A. v. Gonzalez, Nancy
Date
Type
Description
November 14, 2019
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (WITH PROOF OF SERVICE) filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Refers to: Gonzalez, Nancy
November 14, 2019
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A..
November 14, 2019
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Gonzalez, Nancy .
May 31, 2019
Docket Event
Declaration of Non-Service filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Refers to: Gonzalez, Nancy
May 08, 2019
Docket Event
Declaration of Non-Service filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Refers to: Gonzalez, Nancy
April 15, 2019
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed.
April 15, 2019
Docket Event
Summons issued.
April 11, 2019
Docket Event
Original Summons filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Refers to: Gonzalez, Nancy
April 11, 2019
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Refers to: Gonzalez, Nancy
April 11, 2019
Docket Event
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A.. Refers to: Gonzalez, Nancy