Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edwards, Catherine ; Aka : Edwards, Katherine;Aka : Edwards, Cathy filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Medel presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions40 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time268 days |
Original Summons filed by Edwards, Jefri. Refers to: Edwards, Catherine
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Edwards, Jefri.
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Edwards, Jefri. Refers to: Edwards, Catherine
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Judgment (JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY AFTER COURT TRIAL) filed by Edwards, Jefri.
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First) filed by Edwards, Jefri. Refers to: Edwards, Catherine
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Edwards, Catherine.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 27]
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Answer filed by Edwards, Catherine.
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 05/21/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 05/21/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 .
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Edwards, Jefri. Refers to: Edwards, Catherine
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Edwards, Jefri.
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 05/21/2019 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/07/2019 01:15:00 PM.
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/07/2019 02:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice RE: Fee for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge ((DENIED)) filed by Edwards, Catherine.
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: November 04, 2019Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Edwards, Catherine.
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD generated.
Date: August 01, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Edwards, Catherine.
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.
Date: August 01, 2019Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed by Edwards, Catherine.
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice re Status of Limited Civil Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Edwards, Jefri. Refers to: Edwards, Catherine
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Alphabetical SD generated.
Date: August 01, 2019Receipt for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: November 05, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.