Roof Supply G&F San Diego Inc,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Kirk,Ner, Donna E,
against
Chavez, Frank M,
Chavez, Yolanda,
Clark, Kenneth Lee,
Clark, Matthew Scott,
El Cajon Roofing Inc,
(total of 9)
See All
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Richard E. L. Strauss presiding.
Case Details for
Roof Supply G&F San Diego Inc v. Chavez, Frank M
, et al.
Case Events for
Roof Supply G&F San Diego Inc v. Chavez, Frank M
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
November 22, 2019
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 11/22/2019 10:45:00 AM.
November 22, 2019
Docket Event
Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.
November 22, 2019
Docket Event
Notice of Dismissal SD generated.
October 25, 2019
Docket Event
OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 11/22/2019 at 10:45AM before Judge Richard E. L. Strauss.
October 25, 2019
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.
October 25, 2019
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/25/2019 10:15:00 AM.
July 05, 2019
Docket Event
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/25/2019 at 10:15:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.
July 05, 2019
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/25/2019 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.
June 04, 2019
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions (Not Entered) filed by Roof Supply G&F San Diego Inc. Refers to: El Cajon Roofing Inc; Clark, Kenneth; Yip, Janice; Nolasco, Quito; Ward, Robert; Ward, Pennie; S M R Investmenst LLC; Hareld, Greg; Chavez, Frank; Chavez, Yolanda; CLARK, MATTHEW; Janice A Yip trustee of the Janice A Yip Living Trust Agreement dated April 24 2007
April 05, 2019
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.