Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Phipps, Lori A, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Blumenthal, Norman B; Zakay, Shani O, against Bhcw Inc; Dba : Soapy Joe'S Car Wash, Soapy Joe'S Inc, represented by Plate, Todd M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Katherine Bacal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine Bacal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: BHCW Inc; Soapy Joe's Inc
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: BHCW Inc; Soapy Joe's Inc
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Complaint filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: BHCW Inc; Soapy Joe's Inc
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 12]
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 8]
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00ADR Packet generated.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Shani O. Zakay) filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Answer filed by Soapy Joe's Inc; B H C W Inc.
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BHCW Inc; Soapy Joe's Inc.
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: BHCW Inc
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Attisha, Lorens
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes San Marcos Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes Bonita Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes La Mesa Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Sweetwater Car Wash LLC
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes Escondido Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes Sorrento Valley Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes Imperial Beach Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes Oceanside Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Sheena, Talal
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes San Ysidro Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: Soapy Joes Rancho San Diego Inc
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/25/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Soapy Joe's Inc.
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/14/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Order - Other (Preliminary Approval Order) filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Motion for Approval of Class Settlement (unopposed motion) filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: January 26, 2021Proof of Service (motion, memorandum, declarations, proposed order) filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: January 26, 2021[Another document for ROA# 90]
Date: January 27, 2021E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: January 27, 2021Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 97]
Date: January 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Motion for Approval of Class Settlement filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Shani O Zakay) filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Phipps, Lori A received but not filed on 09/21/2020.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Service filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/19/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: February 19, 2021Order - Other (Final Approval Order) filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: February 22, 2021Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 08/07/2020 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (first) filed by Phipps, Lori A. Refers to: BHCW Inc; Soapy Joe's Inc
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Phipps, Lori A.
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.