Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Emrani, Babak, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kuperman, Alton F; Schick, Malcolm D, against Goodman Md, Aaron, represented by Mason, Jamie E, Mason, Jamie E; Schafer, Terrence J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Keri Katz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeri Katz Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial178 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions205 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/01/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: October 04, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to discuss scheduling) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: January 20, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 06/24/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/15/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#3) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF MALCOLM D. SCHICK) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#1) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#3) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: January 18, 2023Declaration - Other filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: January 18, 2023Motion in Limine (#2) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/04/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#4) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Emrani, Babak; Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: January 25, 2023Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/16/2022 11:00:00 AM.
Date: December 16, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/20/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: January 20, 2023Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF ALTON F. KUPERMAN) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/27/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: January 12, 2023Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Case reassigned from Styn,Ronald to Katz,Keri effective 04/17/2021
Date: 2021-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Emrani, Babak. Refers to: Goodman MD, Aaron
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Complaint filed by Emrani, Babak. Refers to: Goodman MD, Aaron
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Emrani, Babak. Refers to: Goodman MD, Aaron
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/04/2019 08:31:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 02/28/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st Amended) filed by Emrani, Babak. Refers to: Goodman MD, Aaron
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 02/19/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.
Date: 2020-05-16T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to demurrer) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Informal Discovery Conference (Civil) heard 09/30/2020 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/06/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (Informal Discovery Conference) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Answer filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 02/18/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in C-74 before Keri Katz at Central.
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (TO COMPEL DEPOSITION) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF MALCOM D SCHICK) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Emrani, Babak; Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF MALCOM D. SCHICK) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/02/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/25/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Emrani, Babak received but not filed on 11/30/2021.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Emrani, Babak received but not filed on 06/02/2022.
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by Emrani, Babak; Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Opposition - Other (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Entry of Order) filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to motion to compel) filed by Goodman MD, Aaron.
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Emrani, Babak.
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.