Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Flores, Angela, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Haskins, Steven W, Self-Represented, against Indermill, David R, Nicholson, David Michael; Aka : Nicholson, David Mickey;Aka : Nicholson, Mickey, The Mavin Group West, Janson & Associates Global Consulting Llc, Nicholson, David M; Esa : Nicholson, Mickey, (total of 7) See All represented by Malki, John, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Marcella O McLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 11, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial354 days |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions316 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/18/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Appeal filed by Nicholson, David Michael. Refers to: Pacific Equity Solutions LLC
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Filing SD generated.
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/03/2020 09:40:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Flores, Angela. Refers to: Pacific Equity Solutions LLC
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/25/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Answer filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Answer filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 152]
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/01/2019 09:40:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Correspondence filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Flores, Angela
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 182]
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/03/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal (D081263) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-11-03T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 328]
Date: 2023-11-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF JOHN MALKI) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00The default filed by Nicholson, David Michael was denied. Refers to: Pacific Equity Solutions LLC
Date: 2023-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver ((Granted in whole)) filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/09/2023 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2023-11-09T00:00:00Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00The default filed by Nicholson, David Michael was denied.
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00The default filed by was denied.
Date: 2023-11-21T00:00:00Answer filed by NICHOLSON, David M.
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00The default filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael was denied.
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Timothy Taylor effective 07/31/2020
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 03/05/2021 at 08:45:00 AM in C-70 before Randa Trapp at Central.
Date: 2020-05-16T00:00:00Motion - Other submitted by Nicholson, David Michael rejected on 12/19/2023.
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/25/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 343]
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Motion - Other (FOR RECONSIDERATION) submitted by Nicholson, David Michael rejected on 01/08/2024.
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in whole) filed by NICHOLSON, David M.
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion for reconsideration) filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2024-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action -Rejected
Date: 2023-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Pendency of Action filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael; Nicholson, David Michael.
Date: 2023-09-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 11/13/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of John Malki) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: April 23, 2024Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: April 18, 2024Case Management Statement filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-11-03T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/22/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 155]
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Default (D081263) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/15/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (D081263) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises (COPY) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Janson & Associates Global Consulting LLC
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal (D081263) filed by Nicholson, David Michael.
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Motion - Other (Stay) filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice RE: Fee for Record on Appeal (D081263) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/24/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/21/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Order - Other (Ex Parte Application and Order to Stop Lock Out (DENIED)) filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00The default filed by was denied.
Date: 2024-02-23T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 357]
Date: 2024-02-23T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration submitted by NICHOLSON, David Michael rejected on 02/06/2024.
Date: 2024-02-06T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 347]
Date: 2024-02-07T00:00:00The default filed by Nicholson, David Michael was denied.
Date: 2024-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-03-01T00:00:00Objections (Objection to Demurrer) filed by Nicholson, David Michael.
Date: 2024-02-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-03-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-02-13T00:00:00Demurrer filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-02-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-02-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/28/2020 09:40:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Nicholson, David Michael.
Date: 2024-03-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2024-03-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Nicholson, David Michael. Refers to: Pacific Equity Solutions LLC
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF JOHN MALKI) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-02-13T00:00:00Case reassigned from Taylor,Timothy to McLaughlin,Marcella effective 10/14/2023
Date: 2023-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-02-23T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2024-03-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/08/2024 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2024-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-02-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/22/2024 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2024-03-22T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2023-04-14T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2024-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: April 18, 2024Returned Mail (Notice re Fee for CT) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: April 23, 2024Proposed Order submitted by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC received but not filed on 04/18/2024.
Date: 2024-04-18T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2024-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00The default filed by Nicholson, David Michael was denied.
Date: 2024-03-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/24/2023 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2024-04-02T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal (From DCA) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Response (to Order to Show Cause) filed by Nicholson, David Michael.
Date: 2023-03-14T00:00:00Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2024-03-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/30/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2024-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Nicholson, David Michael.
Date: 2024-03-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Non-Service of Motion for Reconsideration) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2024-03-08T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2024-03-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/25/2024 08:30:00 AM.
Date: April 25, 2024Declaration - Other (OF JOHN MALKI) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Update Information) filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of Order to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Flores, Angela.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Demurrer filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail submitted by Flores, Angela rejected on 08/05/2021.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Correspondence (Re: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by NICHOLSON, David Michael.
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/01/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 04/22/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Janson & Associates Global Consulting LLC
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R.
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Answer (to Amended Cross-Complaint) filed by Flores, Angela. Refers to: Pacific Equity Solutions LLC
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Case Management Conference Results) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 05/13/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 185]
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Nicholson, David
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC. Refers to: Flores, Angela
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 196]
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Janson & Associates Global Consulting LLC
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 200]
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Answer filed by INDERMILL, DAVID R; THE MAVIN GROUP WEST.
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Amended Motion filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESULTS) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 09/22/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 09/22/2022 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/18/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Nicholson, David Michael.
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION) filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration filed by Pacific Equity Solutions LLC.
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 357]
Date: 2024-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.