Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hayes, Martell Antoine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goldschmidt, Deon S; Shenouda, Michel R.A., against Hipolito, Efren, represented by Jalali, Lili, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy Taylor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial157 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: January 07, 2021Original Summons filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine. Refers to: Hipolito, Efren
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine.
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/02/2019 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hipolito, Efren.
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine.
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine.
Date: September 15, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine. Refers to: Hipolito, Efren
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 09/18/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: September 18, 2020Answer filed by Hipolito, Efren.
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 10/02/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in C-72 before Timothy Taylor at Central.
Date: 2020-05-16T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: January 07, 2021Proof of Service filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine.
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine.
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: April 07, 2021Complaint filed by Hayes, Martell Antoine. Refers to: Hipolito, Efren
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 28]
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.