Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank vs Kyhl
On February 21, 2019 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Discover Bank, represented by Sebourn, Thomas J, against Kyhl, Ashton, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. Judge Pamela M. Parker presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 21, 2019
Last Refreshed
September 18, 2023
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Discover Bank. | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Kyhl, Ashton . | |
January 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from N-26 to N-03 effective 01/09/2021. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non-Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed. |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons issued. | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department N-26.
Judge: Sim von Kalinowski |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Kyhl, Ashton |
|