Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Velasquez, Blanca R, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov, Steve B, against General Motors Llc, represented by Cowden, Nathaniel R.; Flores, Marlene Kristen, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial241 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Complaint filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Motion - Other (to compel deposition) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 01/10/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Original Summons filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Answer filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 01/22/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in C-67 before Eddie C Sturgeon at Central.
Date: 2020-05-16T00:00:00Statement - Other filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 11/06/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Opposition - Other (Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Nathaniel Cowden) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/04/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: March 09, 2021Motion - Other (to compel compliance with court order) filed by VELASQUEZ, BLANCA R.
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: April 16, 2021Notice - Other (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.