Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniels, Tonja, Harris Jr, Shamiko, Harris Sr, Shamiko, Harris, Tariq, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Self-Represented, against Beiser, Kevin, Bivins, Bruce, Duran, Carmina, Gonzales, Jose ; Esa : Gonzalez, Jose, Grimm, Paul, (total of 5) See All represented by Klekowski, Corrie J; Nguyen, Dani T., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Gregory W Pollack presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2019 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial429 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Soto-Ramos, Jose; Whigham, Myeshia.
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Soto-Ramos, Jose; Whigham, Myeshia.
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sotoramos, Jose; Whigham, Myeshia.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sotoramos, Jose; Whigham, Myeshia.
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Sotoramos, Jose; Whigham, Myeshia.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/24/2019 08:15:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Case reassigned from Judge Wohlfeil, Joel R. to Gregory Pollack effective 06/06/2019
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/30/2019 08:15:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Harris, Shamiko Jr.
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Daniels, Tonja.
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/25/2019 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Dell'Anno, Marlea F.
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Non-Sanction heard 01/31/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 03/06/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by HARRIS, SHAMIKO Sr.
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Daniels, Tonja.
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Peremptory Challenge (DENIED) filed by Daniels, Tonja; Harris, Tariq; Harris, Shamiko Jr.
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Sotoramos, Jose; Whigham, Myeshia.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/13/2020 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sotoramos, Jose; Whigham, Myeshia.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL -GRANTED IN PART) filed by Daniels, Tonja.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Daniels, Tonja.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL - GRANTED IN PART) filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL -GRANTED IN PART) filed by HARRIS, SHAMIKO Sr.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL - GRANTED IN PART) filed by Harris, Shamiko Jr.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by HARRIS, SHAMIKO Sr.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Harris, Shamiko Jr.
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Lynn Ryan) filed by Duran, Carmina; Marten, Cindy; Gonzales, Jose; Ryan, Lynn.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Duran, Carmina; Marten, Cindy; Gonzales, Jose; Ryan, Lynn.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Duran, Carmina; Marten, Cindy; Gonzales, Jose; Ryan, Lynn.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/08/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by Harris, Shamiko Jr; HARRIS, SHAMIKO Sr; Harris, Tariq; Daniels, Tonja.
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Answer filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/18/2020 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Duran, Carmina; Marten, Cindy; Gonzales, Jose; Ryan, Lynn.
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Duran, Carmina; Marten, Cindy; Gonzales, Jose; Ryan, Lynn.
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/04/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice - Other (of non opposition to motion for attorney fees) filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Duran, Carmina; Marten, Cindy; Gonzales, Jose; Ryan, Lynn.
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/05/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by San Diego Unified School District.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Dani Nguyen) filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/06/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (to compel responses to special interrogatories) filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Motion - Other (to compel responses to request for production of documents) filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to compel response to special interrogatories) filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/25/2022 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order for Return of Exhibits filed by Harris, Tariq; Grimm, Paul.
Date: October 14, 2022Verdict (Special Verdict Form) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: October 13, 2022Exhibit List (Joint Trial Exhibit List) filed by Harris, Tariq; Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/12/2022 09:30:00 AM.
Date: October 12, 2022Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/07/2022 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/11/2022 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: May 11, 2023Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/13/2022 09:30:00 AM.
Date: October 13, 2022Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 09/16/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 10/07/2022 02:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Corrie J Klekowski) filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Notice - Other (DEFENDANT PAUL GRIMM'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF VIDEO CLIPS) filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/10/2022 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Request for Court Reporter By Party with a Fee Waiver filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 05/27/2022 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Motion - Other (TO QUASH) submitted by Harris, Tariq rejected on 01/06/2022.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00$FILINGDOCUMENT submitted by $PARTNAME rejected on $REJECTIONDATE.
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Post-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Post-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED IN WHOLE) filed by Harris, Shamiko Jr.
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/26/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Grimm, Paul received but not filed on 07/22/2022.
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Returned Mail (Not Deliverable As Addressed - Tonja Daniels) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Grimm, Paul.
Date: January 13, 2023Trial Brief (Plaintiff Tariq Harris Trial Brief) submitted by Harris, Tariq rejected on 10/11/2022.
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Trial Brief (Plaintiff Tariq Harris' Trial Brief) filed by Harris, Tariq.
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions (GIVEN) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: October 13, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.