Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kahn, Michael D, against Oar, David, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Edlene C. McKenzie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdlene C. McKenzie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration of Non-Service filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: OAR, DAVID
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Synchrony Bank.
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Synchrony Bank.
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 18]
Date: August 09, 2021Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Synchrony Bank.
Date: August 06, 2021E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: August 09, 2021Original Summons filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: OAR, DAVID
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: OAR, DAVID
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: OAR, DAVID
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: OAR, DAVID
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: 2020-01-11T00:00:00Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Synchrony Bank.
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Synchrony Bank.
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: OAR, DAVID
Date: October 25, 2021Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: OAR, DAVID
Date: October 25, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.