Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Td Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vlachos, Michael, against Verdon, Daniele C, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Earl H. Maas III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEarl H. Maas III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time318 days |
Case reassigned from Maas,Earl to N-26 effective 02/16/2019.
Date: February 16, 2019Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by TD Bank USA NA.
Date: November 14, 2019Original Summons filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Verdon, Daniele
Date: December 31, 2018Declaration of Non-Service filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Verdon, Daniele
Date: February 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Verdon, Daniele
Date: December 31, 2018Case initiation form printed.
Date: December 31, 2018Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA NA. Refers to: Verdon, Daniele
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.