Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Arrincon-Tepeli, Gissela, against Mosqueda, Edgar, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time592 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: December 21, 2018Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to N-26 effective 02/16/2019.
Date: February 16, 2019[A document for ROA# 2]
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Case reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Dahlquist,Robert effective 12/29/2018
Date: December 29, 2018Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Mosqueda, Edgar
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.