Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fc Marketplace Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hynick, George R, against Ave Del Paraiso Inc, Gonzalez, Jose, represented by Freshman, Ronald H, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial274 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions546 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018
Date: 2018-12-29T00:00:00Original Summons filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Answer filed by AVE DEL PARAISO INC; Gonzalez, Jose.
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Complaint filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC; Gonzalez, Jose
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by FC Marketplace LLC.
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/17/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by FC Marketplace LLC.
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by FC Marketplace LLC.
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: Gonzalez, Jose
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 45]
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 09/13/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 02/21/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by FC Marketplace LLC.
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by AVE DEL PARAISO INC; Gonzalez, Jose.
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Judgment submitted by FC Marketplace LLC rejected on 06/16/2020. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by FC Marketplace LLC.
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 03/13/2020 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by FC Marketplace LLC.
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/26/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by FC Marketplace LLC.
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 51]
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by FC Marketplace LLC. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: August 03, 2021E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: April 09, 2021The default filed by was denied. Refers to: AVE DEL PARAISO INC
Date: April 09, 2021The default was denied as to AVE DEL PARAISO INC on Complaint filed by FC Marketplace LLC .
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 58]
Date: April 09, 2021Judgment by Default by Court (Not Entered) submitted by FC Marketplace LLC rejected on 12/02/2020.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.