Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Jacobsen, Devin, against Johns, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Earl H. Maas III presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time495 days |
Writ of Execution issued.
Date: August 03, 2019Case reassigned from Maas,Earl to N-26 effective 02/16/2019.
Date: February 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Johns, Andrew
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Johns, Andrew
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: June 15, 2019Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-10-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Midland Funding LLC.
Date: February 04, 2020Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Johns, Andrew
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Midland Funding LLC.
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.