Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Collins, Emily, against Langdon, Adam T, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time190 days |
Original Summons filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Langdon, Adam
Date: September 27, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Langdon, Adam
Date: September 27, 2018Declaration of Non-Service filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Langdon, Adam
Date: April 05, 2019Declaration of Non-Service filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Langdon, Adam
Date: November 27, 2018Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Langdon, Adam
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by Citibank NA. Refers to: Langdon, Adam
Date: December 31, 2018Case initiation form printed.
Date: October 08, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.