Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Grigoryan, Meline, against Charles, Jamise, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions525 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Charles, Jamise
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Charles, Jamise
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Midland Funding LLC rejected on 02/26/2021.
Date: February 26, 2021Judgment submitted by Midland Funding LLC rejected on 03/06/2020.
Date: March 06, 2020Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: 2020-01-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Midland Funding LLC.
Date: December 22, 2021[Another document for ROA# 13]
Date: March 06, 2020Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Charles, Jamise
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Charles, Jamise
Date: March 06, 2020Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Charles, Jamise
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Charles, Jamise
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.