Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sellay, Spencer, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Santino, Wendi E, against Developers Surety And Indemnity Company, International Fidelity Insurance Company, Lomelin, Francisco ; Dba : Doowood Construction, represented by Freedman, Edward W, Malachowski, Mitchell B, Santino, Wendi E, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Richard E. L. Strauss presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial484 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Substitution of Attorney filed by Lomelin, Francisco.
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 22]
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company.
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/14/2019 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Lomelin, Francisco. Refers to: SELLAY, SPENCER; Brown, Lisa
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/20/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Unavailabilty of Counsel) filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Answer (to the CROSS-COMPLANT) filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 05/03/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Statement - Other filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Answer filed by Lomelin, Francisco.
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Lomelin, Francisco. Refers to: SELLAY, SPENCER; Brown, Lisa
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Lomelin, Francisco.
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Wendi E Santino) filed by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Answer filed by Brown, Lisa; International Fidelity Insurance Company.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/27/2019 10:15:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Brown, Lisa; SELLAY, SPENCER received but not filed on 03/15/2019.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Lomelin, Francisco.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Lomelin, Francisco.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/24/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.