Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Baldaro, Aaron, against Donnarumma, Ralani, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time321 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Donnarumma, Ralani
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Answer filed by Donnarumma, Ralani.
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (06/21/2019) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (06/21/2019) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Proposed Order (06/21/2019) filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Donnarumma, Ralani
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Original Summons filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Donnarumma, Ralani
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 11]
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Donnarumma, Ralani
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (06/21/2019) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (06/21/2019) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to N-26 effective 02/16/2019.
Date: 2019-02-16T00:00:00Proposed Order (06/21/2019) filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/21/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: June 21, 2019Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/03/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Donnarumma, Ralani.
Date: June 06, 2019Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: June 21, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.