American Express National Bank Successor By Merger To American Express Bank Fsb,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Michael, Lina M,
against
Garcia, Corazon ; Aka : Garcia, Corazon N,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Edlene C. McKenzie presiding.
Case Details for
American Express National Bank Successor By Merger To American Express Bank Fsb v. Garcia, Corazon ; Aka : Garcia, Corazon N
Case Events for
American Express National Bank Successor By Merger To American Express Bank Fsb v. Garcia, Corazon ; Aka : Garcia, Corazon N
Date
Type
Description
June 28, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB.
June 28, 2021
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Garcia, Corazon .
June 28, 2021
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal) Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB.
May 24, 2021
Docket Event
Affidavit - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements) Affidavit - Other filed by American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB.
January 11, 2020
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
September 10, 2019
Docket Event
Declaration of Non-Service filed by American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Garcia, Corazon
August 26, 2019
Docket Event
Declaration of Non-Service filed by American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB.
August 26, 2019
Docket Event
Declaration of Non-Service filed by American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Garcia, Corazon
January 17, 2019
Docket Event
Declaration of Non-Service filed by American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Garcia, Corazon
October 29, 2018
Docket Event
Declaration of Non-Service filed by American Express National Bank Successor by Merger to American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Garcia, Corazon