Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of Encinitas filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Robert P Dahlquist presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time442 days |
Case reassigned from Judge Bacal, Katherine to Ronald Frazier effective 12/21/2018
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Original Summons filed by LeRuth, Linda. Refers to: City of Encinitas; Sunset Mountain Investors LLC
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Transferred case received on 12/21/2018 .
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Case file contents transferred to receiving court San Diego pursuant to court order.
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Complaint filed by LeRuth, Linda. Refers to: City of Encinitas; Sunset Mountain Investors LLC
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Case reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Dahlquist,Robert effective 12/29/2018
Date: 2018-12-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by City of Encinitas. Refers to: Sunset Mountain Investors LLC
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (MEET AND CONFER) filed by LeRuth, Linda.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: May 14, 2019Answer filed by Sunset Mountain Investors LLC.
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Answer filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by LeRuth, Linda. Refers to: City of Encinitas
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: May 14, 2019Notice - Other (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Application - Other (APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH) filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (05/10/2019) filed by LeRuth, Linda.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Answer filed by LeRuth, Linda.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by LeRuth, Linda.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Sunset Mountain Investors LLC. Refers to: LeRuth, Linda; City of Encinitas
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by City of Encinitas.
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.