Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wong, Jennifer, against Silva, Rosa M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Edlene C. McKenzie presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions294 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time525 days |
Proof of Service filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Silva, Rosa
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Silva, Rosa
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Silva, Rosa
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Silva, Rosa
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: July 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: November 06, 2019Writ of Execution issued.
Date: March 05, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.