Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Collins, Emily, against Malpica, Heliodora, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions202 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time607 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A.
Date: August 08, 2023Writ of Execution issued.
Date: September 13, 2019Writ of Execution submitted by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A rejected on 02/13/2020.
Date: February 13, 2020Declaration of Non-Service filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A. Refers to: MALPICA, HELIODORA
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Original Summons filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A. Refers to: MALPICA, HELIODORA
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A. Refers to: MALPICA, HELIODORA
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A. Refers to: MALPICA, HELIODORA
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 19]
Date: February 13, 2020Proof of Service filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A.
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A. Refers to: MALPICA, HELIODORA
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A.
Date: September 10, 2021Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: June 18, 2019Statement of Venue filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A.
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK [USA] N A.
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.