Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kyriakides, Angel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Yaeckel, Eric K, against Rp Automotive Inc, represented by Walker, Megan E., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Loren G. Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial253 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time279 days |
Case Management Statement filed by Kyriakides, Angel.
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by RP Automotive Inc.
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Kyriakides, Angel.
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by RP Automotive Inc.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by RP Automotive Inc received but not filed on 12/05/2018.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Complaint filed by Kyriakides, Angel. Refers to: RP Automotive Inc
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed by RP Automotive Inc.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Kyriakides, Angel. Refers to: RP Automotive Inc
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Order - Other filed by Kyriakides, Angel.
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Case reassigned from Meyer,John to Freestone,Loren effective 03/19/2023
Date: March 19, 2023Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: June 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kyriakides, Angel. Refers to: RP Automotive Inc
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.