Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Prominence Willmark Communities Inc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cox, Ben, against Dohrer, Chrstopher, Dohrer, Rosemary, Fernandez, Natalie, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time683 days |
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Prominence Willmark Communities Inc.
Date: August 10, 2020Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Prominence Willmark Communities Inc.
Date: November 14, 2018Writ of Possession issued.
Date: October 24, 2018Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Writ of Execution issued.
Date: December 31, 2019Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Prominence Willmark Communities Inc.
Date: November 29, 2018Substitution of Attorney filed by Prominence Willmark Communities Inc.
Date: June 11, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.