Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
North County Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Silverman, Timothy J, against Ahmed, Zaber, Opsahl, Ursula A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Jacqueline M. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions145 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time176 days |
[Another document for ROA# 17]
Date: January 29, 2019Statement of Venue filed by North County Credit Union. Refers to: Opsahl, Ursula; Ahmed, Zaber
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by North County Credit Union. Refers to: Opsahl, Ursula; Ahmed, Zaber
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Original Summons filed by North County Credit Union. Refers to: Opsahl, Ursula; Ahmed, Zaber
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by North County Credit Union. Refers to: Opsahl, Ursula; Ahmed, Zaber
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by North County Credit Union.
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by North County Credit Union.
Date: January 15, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.